+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 755
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/3/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/27/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/18/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/12/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/5/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0922
Amendment 1-0 to HB2322
+ − Votes (3)
March 27, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 18, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
March 12, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor