+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2016
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/2/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor