+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 523
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/22/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/15/2018
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/13/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/7/2018
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 13, 2018: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 13, 2018: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 7, 2018: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 7, 2018: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2