+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/17/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/17/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.