+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
- Pub. Ch. 944
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 3
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2022
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/23/2022
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2022
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2022
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/9/2022
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/2/2022
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/2/2022
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2022
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
April 7, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 3
April 7, 2022: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 23, 2022: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 16, 2022: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor