+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 688
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/1/2020
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/11/2020
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/4/2020
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
- Ref. to Local Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
June 1, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 11, 2020: HOUSE LOCAL COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 4, 2020: HOUSE CITIES & COUNTIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor