+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/8/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/8/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/1/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/25/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/25/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to last calendar
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/25/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 25, 2014: EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor