+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/6/2019
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2019: HOUSE LOCAL COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
February 27, 2019: HOUSE PROPERTY & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor