+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/18/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor