+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1076)
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2014
- Reset on Regular cal. for 4/14/14
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/9/2014
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/1/2014
- Action Def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/2/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/26/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/18/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA1076
Amendment 1-0 to HB2285
+ − Votes (3)
April 14, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
April 1, 2014: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
March 18, 2014: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor