+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/19/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.