+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 489
- Effective date(s) 05/24/2019
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 93, Nays 0 PNV 0
- H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 5/1/19
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0109)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0418)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0061)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/26/2019
- Rec for pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/12/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref. to Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Clerk's desk.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee to 2/26/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
May 2, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
April 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 26, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 20, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 12, 2019: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 5, 2019: HOUSE FACILITIES, LICENSURE, & REGULATIONS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor