+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 819
- Effective date(s) 04/24/2018
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 90, Nays 1 PNV 0 HB2279
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0756)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA1026)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA1027)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 1
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/12/2018
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0907)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0815)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2018
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/20/2018
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/7/2018
- Action def. in Business and Utilities Committee to 3/7/2018
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 2/28/2018
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
- Move to Heel
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/20/2018
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 2/20/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/13/2018
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (13)
April 12, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 3
- Yeas: 94
April 11, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
March 26, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
March 26, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 26, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 20, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 20, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 14, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 14, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 7, 2018: HOUSE BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 7, 2018: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 20, 2018: HOUSE BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
February 20, 2018: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor