+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 3, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1128
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2022
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2022
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/6/2022
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2022
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/22/2022
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/15/2022
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 3/15/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/8/2022
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
- Ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 27, 2022: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 26, 2022: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 26, 2022: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 22, 2022: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 15, 2022: HOUSE PROPERTY & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor