+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 747
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/13/2014
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/13/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/6/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/26/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/19/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0732
Amendment 1-0 to HB2274
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
February 26, 2014: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
February 19, 2014: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor