+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 797
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2014
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 74, Nays 5, PNV 2
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/3/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/19/2014
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/11/2014
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 27, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
February 19, 2014: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
February 11, 2014: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (15)
Akbari
Type:
Primary Sponsor