+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020
- Action def. in Education Committee to 3/18/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/11/2020
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
- Ref. to Education Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction