+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 795
- Effective date(s) 01/01/2015
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0708)
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/27/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/18/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/4/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/25/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/19/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee--Government Operations for review
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0708
Amendment 1-0 to HB2255
+ − Votes (8)
April 7, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 32
March 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
March 20, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 18, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
March 12, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
March 4, 2014: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE
February 25, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
February 19, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (84)
Type:
Primary Sponsor