+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 682
- Effective date(s) 04/12/2018
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0808)
- Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 2
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 71, Nays 17, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0754)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/6/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Action def. in Health Committee to 3/6/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
March 29, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 12, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 12, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 20
March 12, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 20
March 12, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 6, 2018: HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 6, 2018: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 21, 2018: HOUSE HEATH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
February 21, 2018: HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor