+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 978
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/16/2014
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed Behind the Budget
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/26/2014
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/18/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
April 16, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
April 15, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 9, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
March 12, 2014: TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor