+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/3/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/28/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2018: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
March 28, 2018: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor