+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 902
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2022
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/30/2022
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2022
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/22/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2022
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/15/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2022
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2022: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 30, 2022: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 22, 2022: HOUSE HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor