+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 99, Nays 0, PNV 0
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/2/2020
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2020
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/25/2020
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/18/2020
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 99