+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 662
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/26/2018
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/20/2018
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/20/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/13/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (5)
March 26, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 98
March 20, 2018: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 20, 2018: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 7, 2018: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
March 7, 2018: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor