+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1053
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/19/2016
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2016
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2016
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/12/2016
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 4/6/2016
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/29/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/29/2016
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/22/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/22/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/15/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/9/2016
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/9/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/2/2016
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/2/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/24/2016
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/17/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee--Business & Utilities--Government Operations for review
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
- Intro.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (7)
April 20, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
April 19, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
April 18, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
April 12, 2016: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
April 6, 2016: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
March 29, 2016: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
March 9, 2016: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor