+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/19/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/12/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/26/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.