+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 995
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/28/2018
- Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 2/28/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/21/2018
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
April 23, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 23, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 18, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 18, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 18, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 18, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 28, 2018: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 28, 2018: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 13, 2018: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
February 13, 2018: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor