+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 776
- Effective date(s) 04/19/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 2, PNV 3
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2018
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/20/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/6/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (12)
April 4, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
April 2, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 2
April 2, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 2, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 20, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 20, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 14, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 14, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 6, 2018: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 6, 2018: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 28, 2018: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
February 28, 2018: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor