+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 227
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/19/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/27/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/19/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0052
Amendment 1-0 to HB0218
+ − Votes (5)
March 21, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 19, 2013: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
March 13, 2013: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
February 27, 2013: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
February 19, 2013: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor