+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 948
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/11/2016
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/24/2016
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/16/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
April 11, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 11, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2016: HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 16, 2016: HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (3)
T. Hill
Type:
Primary Sponsor