+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 861
- Effective date(s) 04/19/2016
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0851)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0899)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/31/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2016
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/16/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/8/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 32
March 31, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
March 16, 2016: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 8, 2016: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (13)
T. Hill
Type:
Primary Sponsor