+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 809
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/22/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/22/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/15/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/15/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/8/2016
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/2/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2016: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 2, 2016: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor