+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 306
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/7/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/1/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/25/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2015
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (13)
April 14, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 14, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 14, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 7, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 7, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 7, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 1, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 1, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 1, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 25, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 25, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 17, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
March 17, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor