+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/16/2020
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/16/2020
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
- Placed behind the budget
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 6/2/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Action def. in Health Committee to 3/17/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/10/2020
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 2/25/2020
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction