+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 03/28/2022
- Pub. Ch. 686
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 1
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0523)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0558)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2022
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/23/2022
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/15/2022
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
March 7, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 1