+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 609
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/13/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 2/28/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Filed for intro.