+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Held on desk.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/3/2014
- Reset on Regular cal. for 4/03/14
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/27/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/20/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/13/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/11/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/5/2014
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/25/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/19/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.