+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 774
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0999)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0820)
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2018
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/27/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 4, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 4, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 4, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 85
April 4, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 27, 2018: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 27, 2018: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 21, 2018: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
March 21, 2018: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor