+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 647
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/22/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/18/2016
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/16/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/10/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
February 22, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
February 22, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
February 16, 2016: TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 10, 2016: TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor