+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 669
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- H. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 91, Nays 2 PNV 0 HB2148
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/14/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0627)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0620)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 2, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/3/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/25/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 2/23/2016
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/17/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 14, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 31
March 3, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 3, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 2
February 23, 2016: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 17, 2016: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor