+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (58)
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 05/02/2022; 07/01/2022
- Pub. Ch. 966
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1&2 Ayes 63, Nays 24 PNV 1 HB2143
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 9 - HA0983)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0904)
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 3 - HA0977)
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 4 - HA0978)
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 5 - HA0979)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0904)
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 7 - HA0981)
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 6 - HA0980)
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 8 - HA0982)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0878)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0965)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/28/22
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 66, Nays 28, PNV 1
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment tabled (Amendment 4 - SA0966)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 5
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0947)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0769)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2022
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/11/2022
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/5/2022
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Action def. in Education Administration to 4/6/2022
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/30/2022
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/22/2022
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/22/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/15/2022
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/15/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/8/2022
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
- Ref. to Education Administration
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (30)
+ − Votes (18)
April 28, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 1 & 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Table Amend# 4 by Yarbro
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY STEWART AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY CLEMMONS AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY THOMPSON AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY TOWNS AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 7 BY CLEMMONS AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 8 BY JOHNSON G. AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 9 BY STEWART AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
April 27, 2022: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2022: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
April 19, 2022: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
April 11, 2022: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
April 5, 2022: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
March 22, 2022: K-12 SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor