+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1008
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2018
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2018
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Move to Heel
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/23/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/23/2018
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2018
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/3/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/27/2018
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/27/2018
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/20/2018
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/20/2018
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/13/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- Reassigned to Civil Justice Committee-- Education Administration and Planning
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (12)
April 25, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 25, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 23, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 23, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 23, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 23, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 3, 2018: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 3, 2018: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 27, 2018: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Education Administration & Planning
March 27, 2018: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Education Administration & Planning
March 7, 2018: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
March 7, 2018: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (57)
VanHuss
Type:
Primary Sponsor