+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
- Reset on Final cal. of Health Subcommittee
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor