+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 05/15/2018
- Pub. Ch. 955
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 92, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB2118
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA1147)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/24/2018
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1107)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0729)
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/3/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/14/2018
- Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/14/2018
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/7/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2018
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/21/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (15)
April 24, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1
- Yeas: 95
April 23, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 11
April 12, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 12, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 12, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
April 3, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 3, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 28, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 28, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 14, 2018: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 14, 2018: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 27, 2018: HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
February 27, 2018: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
February 21, 2018: HOUSE HEATH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
February 21, 2018: HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (15)
Kumar
Type:
Primary Sponsor