+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 5/27/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 3/17/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction