+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On June 8, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020
- Re-ref. Judiciary Committee
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/3/20
- Reset on next avail. cal.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0609)
On May 5, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-20
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Reset on cal. for 3/19/2020
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/4/2020
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 2/25/2020
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction