+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/25/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Meeting Cancelled. Reset on Transportation Subcommittee cal. for next meeting.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/18/2015
On January 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
- Ref. to Transportation Committee
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, held on desk - pending appointment of standing committees
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor