+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 483
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/2013
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2013
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2013
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, ways & Means
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to lottery calendar
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2013
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/26/2013
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/26/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/19/2013
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
April 18, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
February 26, 2013: EDUCATION COMMITTEE
February 19, 2013: EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor