+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/23/2022
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2022
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2022
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/9/2022
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/2/2022
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2022: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 16, 2022: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor