+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/20/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
- Move to Heel
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/14/2018
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Roll 5 places
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/28/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.